HomeОбразованиеRelated VideosMore From: tecmath

Fast Math Tricks - How to multiply 2 digit numbers up to 100 - the fast way!

43325 ratings | 6212033 views
How to multiply 2 digit numbers numbers up to 100 - calculating the fast way! Using this method you will be able to multiply any pair of two digit numbers with each other - faster than a calculator! Become a math genius in no time at all using vedic math! To see how to multiply 2 and 3 digits using a variation of this trick follow this link: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=lvnSTezEvME
Html code for embedding videos on your blog
Text Comments (4185)
Ahsan Ali (14 hours ago)
Very IMPORTANT https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=pAFutmfKE1M&t=246s
Paul C (15 hours ago)
Rubbish !
My Conutry Pakistan Piraez bond Latry Faynal Nombr Help Fst ....... Secint ....... Soon
Hello Faynal Frgar My Help +923027509442 R My Whats App Nombr Mazhar
Kathleen Diana (1 day ago)
I tried using different numbers but it didn't work for 32*48... maybe I did something wrong?
PAPLU TRIPURA (2 days ago)
Wat abt 99×99=
Herrkonghmong Vue (7 days ago)
Love this guy he's getting me work up about math again
Ningthoujam Taison (8 days ago)
Please calculate 25times 25
pereti wallace (8 days ago)
Awesome
Keys Sarker (8 days ago)
Thank you very much techmath.You helped me do maths fast.
findlay c (9 days ago)
704 3213 4182
Порт Лав (9 days ago)
thanks
Draken XXX (9 days ago)
WHy does it not work for this one. 43X56=??? The method aint work for this. I got 23,918 using the method. The correct answer is 2, 408. ??
Super Girly Girl (11 days ago)
OMG LIFESAVER 😁
Umang Taneja (13 days ago)
The maths trick is as amazing as you're accent dude!
Pacific Oceania (15 days ago)
What about this number : 89× 79 = ? 97× 88 = ? 79× 97 = ?
Prajapati Yogesh (16 days ago)
92*98 what's the answer according to your trick
Isabela Azevedo (16 days ago)
Congratulations
MM17 (17 days ago)
THANKS!
RuvickFromYT (17 days ago)
Thanks!
Terry Nolan (18 days ago)
I am 60 was always useless at maths (terrified of it) but this guy is really helpful...thank you !!
Siti Rahma (19 days ago)
How about 78x67? What's rule a method please? What's rule if make underscore or not?
mohamed elbihize (20 days ago)
o
Julie M (20 days ago)
Thank you tecmath because of you iam getting nice marks and for it is very easy thank you for your lovely mathematics trick
Omsingh Taank (20 days ago)
This is really nice...thank you sir.
Dat Dude (21 days ago)
This is good I admit :D
rr 2 (21 days ago)
Can you slove 45*95
Matthew Brown (22 days ago)
His voice has definitely broken.
Hashim Aachi (22 days ago)
I cant get 35*36
Ben Griffin (22 days ago)
This method is great. The video would be far better if it included specifics for cases when the product of the right-most digits of the two number being multiplied is a double digit. Avoiding the discussion by only using numbers with small final digits is disappointing to see.
Matthew Rammig (22 days ago)
Check out Scott Flansburg. His the Michael Jordan of teaching mental math.
Battle Best (22 days ago)
You are awesome man. Thanks
Khaja raheem khan (23 days ago)
Bro what about 46 multiplied by 59
Flight (24 days ago)
I have a much faster way and its my head lol
Raven Wood (24 days ago)
Love it!
James Brown (25 days ago)
And if you needed to get a piece of paper and pen like the tutorial don’t get dispondant. Just use your phone
Jacqueline H (25 days ago)
Art yes!....maths nòoooo
Peter Andreas H (25 days ago)
What? I thought this was completely normal, we learned this in 3rd or 4th grade here in my school in Denmark. How do you learn it in other places?
Goatnite Gaming (9 days ago)
Peter Andreas H also not sure if I understood what you were asking because it translated what you were trying to say weird I think
Goatnite Gaming (9 days ago)
Peter Andreas H It was just because they did the same thing just switching the steps, so it looks easier. But it’s not anything special
Peter Andreas H (13 days ago)
Goatnite Gaming You do? There was just so many people up and ringing about it. (Can you say that?) Thank you anyway!
Goatnite Gaming (14 days ago)
Peter Andreas H this is how everyone learns it lol
Serbia Care Act (27 days ago)
An Australian who knows multiplication! How is this not viral?
Nikos Gewrgiou (27 days ago)
16x74.
Muniba Kamran (29 days ago)
Waao
AndroiD MasteR (29 days ago)
Thanks.
Fun arts (1 month ago)
NICE TRICK BUT YOUR WORD WERE NOT CLEAR I CAN'T HEAR PROPERLY YOU WERE SPEAKING VERY FAST ⏩
Hikaroto (1 month ago)
If i do 19x60 the result is wrong by this method, why?
Hikaroto (1 month ago)
This is the most amazing vid ever, brutal!! Thank you so much
Janel Farmer (1 month ago)
All your examples only have the digit after the space as a single number! Like when multiplying 51 x 53. BUT what if the digit after the space is a DOUBLE digit like in multiplying 58 x 58?? You don't explain that! Can your method be used and how?
ZAVEN GALSTYAN (1 month ago)
красавец 😎
Mental mind motivation (1 month ago)
very bad
jesson pulutan (1 month ago)
Can you all try 63 x 44 see if it works, It doesn't work with all the numbers
Music Is My Life (1 month ago)
Dont forget to watch my new video https://youtu.be/yecuoo63ZoM
Randall Gonzales (1 month ago)
I'm in tears man I'm learning.never have I be able see how to do this .I love it thank you sir!
Philip Keith Wilson (1 month ago)
Great class and great voice.
Saso Nikolov (1 month ago)
Try 89x89 😉
jonathan cook (1 month ago)
this is the long way trick.
ex DOGE (1 month ago)
i love your crispy accent
carolyn gwin (1 month ago)
It is 61 right🤔🤔🤔
VIP STRONG (1 month ago)
22×32=704 51×63=3213 82×51=4182
VIP STRONG (1 month ago)
I am Right Sir
Jagannath Buvaji (1 month ago)
You hve not explained regarding the multiplication of two units place which will be equal to ten or greater than ten .You hve taken those numbers of which the multipli cation is less than ten
Alex A (1 month ago)
Lol it’s funny how he gives u like 5 seconds at the beginning of the videos like I’m gonna answer it like what am I here for if I could do that ? 😂
Drako (1 month ago)
With if the final numbers are larger
ADNAN KHAN* (1 month ago)
*nice*
Alysha-Teen cardona (1 month ago)
345×489?
Alysha-Teen cardona (1 month ago)
How about more than digits
I dont get it
James Radovich (1 month ago)
Brilliant! Thanks very much. This sounds similar to the Trachtenberg method of mathematics.
Ken Hill (1 month ago)
So many comments! I will see how well it works on the Ninimaths app I play all the time. Generally I have a variety of methods, but have never tried anything quite like this.
arish hussanie (1 month ago)
thanks sir
flaco (1 month ago)
Nice. I love it. Have you ever thought of doing ASMR videos? You should try it. Your voice is perfect for it.
AVIJIT BALABANTARAY (1 month ago)
hyyy just do 63x67 in this method.its showing 42021
Madhu Gudipati (1 month ago)
There is little bit doubt if the last unit digits get product of two digit
Madhu Gudipati (1 month ago)
What is 72 times 69
A A (1 month ago)
I honestly find it quicker to just work it out
chennu nagalakshmi (1 month ago)
My maths sir said this method how calculate easily by the way this method very easy and quick for simplification and thank u for remember this
Ekta Jain (1 month ago)
Very right...i loved the trick
NZT-48 (1 month ago)
Doesn’t work for 14 x 16 This method give 2024 while the correct answer is 224
NZT-48 (1 month ago)
+Itachi Uchiha ok thanks
Itachi Uchiha (1 month ago)
NZT-48 14 * 16 = 1_(2carry)4 6+4= 10 = 1(10 +2)4 1(12)4 = 224
kamali raveendran (1 month ago)
sorry it is not
kamali raveendran (1 month ago)
21 multiplied by 31 is 551
Kanta Bisht (1 month ago)
Save yourself from embarrassment . Make sure not to apply this trick in case u wanna multiply 96*97 or 97*98 or 95*97 and so on .
kazi hafchha (2 months ago)
can you do 20x15 with that method
Mary Stock (2 months ago)
So cool it worked and I even checked with a calculator. Can you do this with 3 digits? If so, can you make a vid on it? Thanks!
Twix _ (2 months ago)
I tried doing 29 times 36 and i got it wrong
Siti Rahma (19 days ago)
Why not add underscore? What's the rule if add zero and underscore?
meh. (2 months ago)
Try 29•36 2•3=6 9•6=54 =654 9•3=27 + 2•6=12 27+12=39 (Add Zero) 654+390=1044
Sphynx (2 months ago)
How would u do 78 x 88
Swarna Das (2 months ago)
Nice accent 😎
deadpoetztampa (2 months ago)
Thank you I'm a 🎓 grad but I need this thanks
Uday Kumar (2 months ago)
please improve your language
Vishali Thamizharasu (2 months ago)
pls solve 78*96
mega sean (2 months ago)
16 55 28 Did I get it right?
carolyn gwin (1 month ago)
mega sean l
Menaka Ghadai (2 months ago)
61×71 is not working
jinglin tang (2 months ago)
how do you multiply numbers up to 1000 ?
Kathy Schmidt (2 months ago)
Bruh
Martin Jensen (2 months ago)
I had IT easier just multiplying in the head. Without That trick
Derangula Sadasiva (2 months ago)
Awesome nice video
Brenz Mona-Taofinuu (2 months ago)
You were right in saying that probably half of us watching aren't even at school, I am one of those people haha
Anisere Oluwaseyi (2 months ago)
This is really great, i must say!
Prem Kumar (2 months ago)
Ossammmm........ gye
IgnitedIce81 (2 months ago)
I hear wrong when you say right, is something wrong with me?
Berceski ? (2 months ago)
18.x 14 is 252 but yet can’t figure out how to do it with this method...l.
Mary chipix (2 months ago)
Hi so,It works, but..... I'm like "23×45......" 23×45 "Let's see um....." 2×4=8 3×5=15 8_ 15, 2×5=10, 3×4= 12 10 + 12 equals 22, 80 + 22 equals........ Oh my gosh I'm so bad at math,102? Yeah. 102 and 8015 will be.... it will be..... Oh my God why am I using the voice text, ok it will be 9035, yeah, then I checked a calculator and shows up to be 1035 which is 800 less than 9035 I mean I mean I mean 8000, ugh, I hate this voice thing, turn off, turn off, Plzzzzzzz, whatever I'm just going to finish this, *Finally finds out how to take out a voice thing and then looks at mess had written down*such a disappointment:( but ya I'm confused Lol (Also this is not a hate or disapproval comment ok
Alvin Cadiz (2 months ago)
what if the other number is 3 digits?
David Zhai (2 months ago)
How to do 66x77

Would you like to comment?

Join YouTube for a free account, or sign in if you are already a member.